[Numeracy 603] Re: Teaching math and numeracy skills to adults learning English
Archived Content Disclaimer
This page contains archived content from a LINCS email discussion list that closed in 2012. This content is not updated as part of LINCS’ ongoing website maintenance, and hyperlinks may be broken.
Mon Nov 1 21:35:00 EDT 2010
- Previous message: [Numeracy 599] Re: Teaching math and numeracy skills to adults learning English
- Next message: [Numeracy 604] Russian peasant multiplication
- Messages sorted by: [ date ] [ thread ] [ subject ] [ author ]
I'm not an expert at this but I get the 630 either way
18 x 35 (strike this because the first number is even)
9 x 70
4 x 140 (strike this because the first number is even)
2 x 280 (strike this because the first number is even)
1 x 560
Therefore: 70 + 560= 630
or
35 x 18
17 x 36
8 x 72 (strike this because the first number is even)
4 x 144 (strike this because the first number is even)
2 x 288 (strike this because the first number is even)
1 x 576
Therefore: 18 + 36 + 576= 630
Maybe someone else already did this...I'm late reading my emails today...if so, sorry for the duplication.
Claire Ludovico
---- "Sherwood wrote:
> Why doesn't this work for 18 X 35? I must be doing something wrong. I
> come up with 665. But when I reverse the numbers to 35 X 18, I get 630
> which is the correct answer. Does it not work in all cases?
>
>
>
> Laura E. Sherwood
>
> Literacy Coordinator
>
> Adult Education
>
> College of Lake County
>
> Grayslake, IL 60030
>
> 847-543-2327
>
> lsherwood at clcillinois.edu
>
>
>
> "Their story, yours, mine - it's what we all carry with us on this trip
> we take, and we owe it to each other to respect our stories and learn
> from them." William Carlos Williams
>
>
>
>
>
> From: numeracy-bounces at lincs.ed.gov
> [mailto:numeracy-bounces at lincs.ed.gov] On Behalf Of Chip Burkitt
> Sent: Wednesday, October 20, 2010 8:34 PM
> To: numeracy at lincs.ed.gov
> Subject: [Numeracy 592] Re: Teaching math and numeracy skills to adults
> learning English
>
>
>
> When I taught basic math at Century College here in Minnesota, I taught
> how to multiply multi-digit numbers. I used the algorithm I learned as a
> child: write down partial products in staggered columns and carry extra
> digits to the next column for adding. Most students were already
> familiar with this method, although strings of zeroes in the
> multiplicands tended to confuse them. However, one student from Russia
> came to me after class and asked if he could use his the method he
> learned in Russia. He showed it to me. (I wish I had written it down
> because I can't remember it.) It took only a few moments reflection to
> realize that his method would work just as well, so I gave him the go
> ahead. The method was very different, but the outcome would always be
> correct.
>
> For students who struggle with the "standard" method of doing
> multiplication, I sometimes explain an alternate method that involves
> halving one multiplicand while doubling the other. After getting down to
> 1 on the first multiplicand, then you eliminate all the pairs (halved,
> doubled) where the halved number is even. Summing the remaining doubled
> numbers gives the correct answer. It basically uses binary arithmetic to
> get partial products and then sum them.
>
> For example:
>
> 37 x 82
> 18 164
> 9 328
> 4 656
> 2 1312
> 1 2624
>
> 82 + 328 + 2624 = 3034
>
> Of course, for some problems this method can be cumbersome, and it
> always pays to put the smaller number first. However, many students find
> it easier to implement.
>
> Chip Burkitt
>
> On 10/20/2010 9:51 AM, Seltenright, Ginny wrote:
>
>
>
> I think that there's a misunderstanding due to the title of the booklet
> referred to here, "The Answer Is Still the Same...It Doesn't Matter How
> You Got It!"'
>
> It does matter how you get there, what doesn't matter is that the
> student uses a different process than what the teacher perhaps is
> showing or another student is using. I went through the TIAN training
> in Arizona which emphasizes student exploration and the idea that there
> are many ways to get to the answer and then having students show how and
> why their answer works (or perhaps doesn't work) and making sure it
> works every time too. It isn't about just getting an answer and it
> being ok- which is possibly how the title may be understood now that I
> am reading this discussion. I agree with you Susan, in that we need to
> be sure the student is making a connection to the problem, the process,
> and what means to them. This is the idea behind the TIAN approach and
> Mary Jane's training involves training teachers to think this way also.
>
>
>
>
>
> Ginny
>
>
>
>
>
> ________________________________
>
> NOTICE: This e-mail (and any attachments) may contain PRIVILEGED OR
> CONFIDENTIAL information and is intended only for the use of the
> specific individual(s) to whom it is addressed. It may contain
> information that is privileged and confidential under state and federal
> law. This information may be used or disclosed only in accordance with
> law, and you may be subject to penalties under law for improper use or
> further disclosure of the information in this e-mail and its
> attachments. If you have received this e-mail in error, please
> immediately notify the person named above by reply e-mail, and then
> delete the original e-mail. Thank you.
>
>
>
> ----------------------------------------------------
> The Math & Numeracy Discussion List
> Numeracy at lincs.ed.gov
> To unsubscribe or change your subscription settings, please go to
> http://lincs.ed.gov/mailman/listinfo/numeracy
> Email delivered to chip.burkitt at orderingchaos.com
- Previous message: [Numeracy 599] Re: Teaching math and numeracy skills to adults learning English
- Next message: [Numeracy 604] Russian peasant multiplication
- Messages sorted by: [ date ] [ thread ] [ subject ] [ author ]